|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Wolverhampton Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. | SLS/196106 |
15/11/1964 | Crewe Works (Side of Works) | Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. | SLS/196412 |
16/02/1968 | CarnforthMPD | Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. | SLS/196803 |
16/02/1968 | Heysham@Neville Hill@12:00@ | 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks. | SLS/196803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/01/1954 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92004 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
27/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southall (81C) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
28/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
30/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
15/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
06/01/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92004 | ||
07/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |