Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 545 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31195 Week
» 129840 Month
» 332504 Year
» 3359357 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3218 |
on |
14/04/1938 |
Great Western Railway |
9018 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean / C. Collett |
Class |
Earl/Dukedog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
Fri 14/04/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/06/1960 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/10/1959 |
Wellington MPD |
Ivatt 2-6-2T 41201 (86K), lately stored at Newport Pill has been transferred here and is at present working the Crewe line (stabling overnight at the former GW depot at Gresty Lane); a further arrival is 41241 ex 82F. 9000 class 9004/14 are in store here-the other three of the class are also stored, viz., 9015/7 at Aberystwyth and 9018 at Oswestry. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/04/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3218 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9018 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
17/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9018 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|