Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 696 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14102 Week
» 67118 Month
» 186645 Year
» 3213498 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3217 |
on |
09/03/1938 |
Great Western Railway |
9017 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean / C. Collett |
Class |
Earl/Dukedog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
Tue 09/03/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/10/1960 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
09/03/1938 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/10/1959 |
Wellington MPD |
Ivatt 2-6-2T 41201 (86K), lately stored at Newport Pill has been transferred here and is at present working the Crewe line (stabling overnight at the former GW depot at Gresty Lane); a further arrival is 41241 ex 82F. 9000 class 9004/14 are in store here-the other three of the class are also stored, viz., 9015/7 at Aberystwyth and 9018 at Oswestry. |
SLS/195912 |
25/10/1960 |
Preserved Dukedog |
9017 is sold, and is now in Oswestry Works. |
SLS/196012 |
23/04/1961 |
Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 822 (receiving repairs and newly fitted with (i) Beyer Peacock Works Plate dated 1902 but without works number, and (ii) Plate indicating W & L No. 1.), 823, 1013, 1619, 5774, 6342, 8498, 9017, 46512. |
SLS/196106 |
06/01/1962 |
Oswestry Works |
Under repair-2236 (89C), 7025 (89A), 78000 (89C), 92247 and W & L 823. 9017 was stored with tender 1805 of May, 1911. |
SLS/196202 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3217 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9017 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
25/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9017 |
|
|