Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1769 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7553 Week
» 28942 Month
» 148469 Year
» 3175322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9016 |
27/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55016 |
16/03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2921/D573 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
27/10/1961 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
30/12/1981 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
07/10/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/10/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/10/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/10/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/10/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/11/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9016 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2921 Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
28/07/1964 |
Naming |
Named 'GORDON HIGHLANDER' at Aberdeen station |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55016 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
30/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55016 |
|
|