Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 719 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 719 Week
» 54173 Month
» 400597 Year
» 3427450 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3210 |
on |
10/04/1937 |
Great Western Railway |
9010 |
on |
26/08/1946 (At Stafford Road) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean / C. Collett |
Class |
Earl/Dukedog |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
Mon 10/04/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/07/1957 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
Total Mileage |
327,789 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3210 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9010 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
13/02/1952 |
To Store |
To Store (Swindon) |
|
|
06/06/1952 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
25/10/1952 |
To Store |
To Store (Swindon) |
|
|
13/01/1953 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/02/1953 |
To Store |
To Store (Swindon) |
|
|
23/10/1953 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
09/04/1956 |
To Store |
To Store () |
|
|
08/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9010 |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|