Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 544 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 544 Week
» 53998 Month
» 400422 Year
» 3427275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9006 |
29/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55006 |
27/03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
29/06/1961 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
08/02/1981 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 07/1981 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
07/04/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
21/06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
64B |
|
Haymarket (New) |
on |
29/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/02/1981 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/04/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/03/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/04/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/03/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9006 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/12/1964 |
Naming |
Named 'THE FIFE & FORFAR YEOMANRY' at Cupar station |
|
|
07/04/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
27/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55006 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
08/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55006 |
|
|
07/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|