Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1422 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32072 Week
» 130717 Month
» 333381 Year
» 3360234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9005 |
25/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55005 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
25/05/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
08/02/1981 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
on 22/02/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
16/04/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
21/08/1969 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
25/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/02/1981 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/04/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/04/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/04/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/04/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9005 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/10/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'THE PRINCE OF WALES'S OWN REGIMENT OF YORKSHIRE' at York station |
|
|
16/04/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
25/04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55005 |
|
|
06/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
08/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55005 |
|
|
22/02/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|