Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3848 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13422 Week
» 78376 Month
» 281040 Year
» 3307893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
90038 |
1990 |
TOPS (90/1) |
90138 |
29/07/1991 |
TOPS (90/0 (R1)) |
90038 |
10/06/1999 |
TOPS (90/2) |
90238 |
02/02/2001 |
TOPS (90/0 (R2)) |
90038 |
26/06/2002 |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90038 |
|
|
29/07/1991 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90138 |
|
|
10/06/1999 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90038 |
|
|
02/02/2001 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90238 |
|
|
26/06/2002 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90038 |
|
|