Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1442 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7226 Week
» 28615 Month
» 148142 Year
» 3174995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9002 |
19/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55002 |
08/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
55 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 2 | Multiple Fitting | Not fitted |
|
To Service |
19/03/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
02/01/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
18/10/1966 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
19/03/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/01/1982 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/11/1967 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/05/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/11/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/05/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9002 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/04/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY' at York station |
|
|
18/10/1966 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55002 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
02/01/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55002 |
|
|