Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1020 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14426 Week
» 67442 Month
» 186969 Year
» 3213822 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
87022 |
11/04/1974 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
30/06/1978 |
Cock o'the North |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
87 |
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
11/04/1974 |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
01/10/2008 |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
11/04/1974 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/2008 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
11/04/1974 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/04/1974 |
To Service |
|
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 87022 |
|
|
01/10/2008 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|