Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17805 Week
» 70821 Month
» 190348 Year
» 3217201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
87005 |
14/08/1973 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
14/08/1973 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1973 |
To Service |
|
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
30/04/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 87005 |
|
|
01/10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J T Lanscapes: at MoD Caerwent |
|
|