Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 814 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14220 Week
» 67236 Month
» 186763 Year
» 3213616 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
TOPS |
87003 |
11/07/1973 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
13/06/1978 |
Patriot |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
11/07/1973 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1973 |
To Service |
|
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|