Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 684 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31334 Week
» 129979 Month
» 332643 Year
» 3359496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8613 |
22/01/1965 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8613 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8030 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
06/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8613 |
|
|
08/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|