Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3916 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29950 Week
» 128595 Month
» 331259 Year
» 3358112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D859 |
09/01/1962 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
VANQUISHER |
09/01/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
43 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
B-B |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L100 |
Works Number |
27988 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
09/01/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
27/03/1971 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Total Mileage |
783,000 miles |
Cut Up |
on 30/06/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels, narrow white band between cab doors almost half way up the bodysides. |
09/01/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/01/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
04/06/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D859, name: VANQUISHER Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27988 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 859 |
|
|
30/06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|