Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1140 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18943 Week
» 71959 Month
» 191486 Year
» 3218339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8545 |
17/09/1963 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8545 Built at Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
06/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8545 |
|
|
11/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|