Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8479 |
on |
30/06/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
82D |
Westbury |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
02/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
05/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8479 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2472 Allocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8479 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|