Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4060 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17466 Week
» 70482 Month
» 190009 Year
» 3216862 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8405 |
04/09/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
04/09/1958 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
30A |
|
Stratford (New) |
on |
04/09/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
06/09/1958 |
15/09/1958 |
Acceptance Tests |
|
|
|
10 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
19/12/1958 |
22/12/1958 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
4 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
01/01/1959 |
06/01/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
27/04/1959 |
02/05/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
31/12/1959 |
12/01/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
13 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
08/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
20 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
04/10/1960 |
29/10/1960 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
26 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
03/02/1961 |
04/03/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
30 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
14/07/1961 |
23/10/1961 |
Adjustment |
|
|
|
102 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
26/01/1962 |
14/02/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
20 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
09/10/1962 |
21/01/1963 |
General |
|
|
|
105 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
29/05/1963 |
26/09/1963 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
121 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
19/09/1964 |
27/10/1964 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
39 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8405 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27676 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Acceptance Tests) - Arr: 06/09/1958. Dep: 15/09/1958. |
|
|
19/12/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1958. Dep: 22/12/1958. |
|
|
01/01/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1959. Dep: 06/01/1959. |
|
|
27/04/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 02/05/1959. |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1959. Dep: 12/01/1960. |
|
|
08/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1960. Dep: 27/02/1960. |
|
|
04/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. |
|
|
03/02/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961. |
|
|
14/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Adjustment) - Arr: 14/07/1961. Dep: 23/10/1961. |
|
|
26/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1962. Dep: 14/02/1962. |
|
|
09/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1962. Dep: 21/01/1963. |
|
|
29/05/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1963. Dep: 26/09/1963. |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1964. Dep: 27/10/1964. |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8405 |
|
|
12/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|