Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6090 Week
» 12224 Month
» 240108 Year
» 1461673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 84017 on 13/10/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 13/10/1953 to Bury (26D)
Withdrawal Sat 11/12/1965
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury (New) 13/10/1953
24F Fleetwood 8w/e 19/06/1954
8M Southport w/e 26/10/1963
9K Bolton w/e 20/06/1964
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 19/06/1965
70D Eastleigh w/e 13/11/1965
91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 06/12/1965
70D Eastleigh 2w/e 06/12/1965
   Withdrawn 11/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26D Bury w/e 17/10/1953
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh w/e 07/11/1965
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region w/e 05/12/1965
WDN   w/e 11/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/10/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 84017
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Bury (26D)
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
11/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 84017    

prev prev