Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 70 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7077 Week
» 13211 Month
» 241095 Year
» 1462660 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 84014 on 22/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 22/09/1953 to Low Moor (25F)
Withdrawal Sat 11/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25F Low Moor (New) 22/09/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 29/01/1955
27C Southport 4w/e 23/04/1955
26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 03/12/1955
26C Bolton w/e 21/02/1959
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 19/12/1964
70D Eastleigh w/e 13/11/1965
91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 06/12/1965
70D Eastleigh 2w/e 06/12/1965
   Withdrawn 11/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25F Low Moor w/e 26/09/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh w/e 07/11/1965
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region w/e 05/12/1965
WDN   w/e 11/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 84014
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Low Moor (25F)
   
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
19/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
11/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 84014    

prev prev