Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 219 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7226 Week
» 13360 Month
» 241244 Year
» 1462809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 84012 on 17/09/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 17/09/1953 to Low Moor (25F)
Withdrawal Sat 12/10/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 10 yrs , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25F Low Moor (New) 17/09/1953
26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 09/10/1954
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 21/05/1955
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 08/10/1955
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
24F Fleetwood w/e 25/03/1961
27C Southport w/e 16/02/1963
   Withdrawn 12/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25F Low Moor w/e 19/09/1953
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   w/e 12/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/09/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 84012
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Low Moor (25F)
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
12/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 84012    

prev prev