Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3789 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13363 Week
» 78317 Month
» 280981 Year
» 3307834 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8401 |
11/06/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
11/06/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
30A |
|
Stratford (New) |
on |
11/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/03/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
06/11/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
19/02/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
01/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
11/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
7 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
20/06/1960 |
30/06/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
11 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
12/07/1960 |
14/07/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
18/07/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
34 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
09/12/1960 |
31/12/1960 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
23 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
27/02/1961 |
28/02/1961 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
15/05/1961 |
19/05/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
24/07/1961 |
26/08/1961 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
34 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
16/12/1961 |
04/01/1962 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
20 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
08/01/1962 |
13/01/1962 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
19/03/1962 |
04/05/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
47 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
21/05/1962 |
26/05/1962 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
19/02/1963 |
05/06/1963 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
107 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
05/07/1963 |
09/07/1963 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
12/07/1963 |
30/07/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8401 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27672 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
11/02/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1959. Dep: 17/02/1959. |
|
|
20/06/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1960. Dep: 30/06/1960. |
|
|
12/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1960. Dep: 14/07/1960. |
|
|
18/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 20/08/1960. |
|
|
09/12/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1960. Dep: 31/12/1960. |
|
|
27/02/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1961. Dep: 28/02/1961. |
|
|
15/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 19/05/1961. |
|
|
24/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1961. Dep: 04/01/1962. |
|
|
08/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 13/01/1962. |
|
|
19/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1962. Dep: 04/05/1962. |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1962. Dep: 26/05/1962. |
|
|
19/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/02/1963. Dep: 05/06/1963. |
|
|
05/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1963. Dep: 09/07/1963. |
|
|
12/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1963. Dep: 30/07/1963. |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8401 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|