Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1275 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19078 Week
» 72094 Month
» 191621 Year
» 3218474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84006 |
on |
26/08/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84006 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84006 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|