Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1673 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19476 Week
» 72492 Month
» 192019 Year
» 3218872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
84003 |
on |
10/08/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 84003 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 84003 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|