Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 585 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13991 Week
» 67007 Month
» 186534 Year
» 3213387 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8326 |
07/02/1968 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20226 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
07/02/1968 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
26/09/1988 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
09/06/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
07/02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1975 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/02/1968 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/02/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8326 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Polmadie (66A) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20226 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
26/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20226 |
|
|
09/06/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|