Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2248 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32898 Week
» 131543 Month
» 334207 Year
» 3361060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8315 |
20/05/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20215 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
20/05/1967 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1992 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 11/2009 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
20/05/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8315 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20215 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/03/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20215 |
|
|
11/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|