Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1036 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6820 Week
» 28209 Month
» 147736 Year
» 3174589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8314 |
20/05/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20214 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
20/05/1967 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
09/06/1993 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
11/11/1993 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
20/05/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8314 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20214 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
09/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20214 |
|
|
11/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|