Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 320 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6104 Week
» 27493 Month
» 147020 Year
» 3173873 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8305 |
22/04/1967 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20205 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
22/04/1967 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
18/12/1989 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
22/04/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
11/1977 |
xos |
Dual brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
fX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8305 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20205 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
18/12/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20205 |
|
|