Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 553 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6337 Week
» 27726 Month
» 147253 Year
» 3174106 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D821 |
25/05/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
GREYHOUND |
25/05/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
25/05/1960 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/12/1972 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,088,000 miles |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/03/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D821, name: GREYHOUND Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 821 from Laira (84A) |
|
|