Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2073 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15479 Week
» 68495 Month
» 188022 Year
» 3214875 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8208 |
07/07/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
07/07/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1964 |
142 |
Exploding Detonator availability tube |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1958 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
29/10/1958 |
14/11/1958 |
Modifications |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
19/07/1960 |
22/07/1960 |
UC |
|
|
|
4 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
26/10/1960 |
12/11/1960 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
18 days |
|
|
|
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
18/01/1962 |
05/02/1962 |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
26/08/1964 |
17/11/1964 |
General G 4
|
|
|
|
84 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8208 Built at British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd. Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green all over, forward facing windows surrounds painted light green |
|
|
29/10/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Modifications) - Arr: 29/10/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (18A) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
10/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
|
|
|
26/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1960. Dep: 12/11/1960. |
|
|
18/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1962. Dep: 05/02/1962. |
|
|
04/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/08/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1964. Dep: 17/11/1964. Work undertaken: G 4
|
|
|
18/11/1964 |
Modification |
Modification: Exploding Detonator availability tube |
|
|
13/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/08/1968 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8208 |
|
|
04/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|