Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8179 |
16/12/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20179 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
16/12/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1972 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
28/02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
28/02/1972 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1972 |
vos |
Vacuum brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
28/02/1972 |
xos |
Dual brakes, No heat, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8179 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
28/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
16/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20179 |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
28/02/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20179 |
|
|
20/02/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|