Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 861 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6645 Week
» 28034 Month
» 147561 Year
» 3174414 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8168 |
19/10/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20168 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (BR)) |
20304 |
15/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (20/0 (R)) |
20168 |
05/03/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
19/10/1966 to Nottingham Division (D16) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1993 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
19/10/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8168 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20168 |
|
|
15/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20304 |
|
|
05/03/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20168 |
|
|
01/05/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20168 |
|
|