Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1789 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7573 Week
» 28962 Month
» 148489 Year
» 3175342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8139 |
26/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20139 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
26/04/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8139 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Birmingham Division (D02) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20139 |
|
|
28/06/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Swindon Works (ZL) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20139 |
|
|