Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8136 |
31/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20136 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
31/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
02/10/1990 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
09/10/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
31/03/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8136 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20136 |
|
|
02/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20136 |
|
|
09/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|