Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3447 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16853 Week
» 69869 Month
» 189396 Year
» 3216249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8100 |
22/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20100 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
22/11/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
05/05/1989 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
27/02/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
22/11/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/11/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8100 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20100 |
|
|
12/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
17/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Millerhill (MH) |
|
|
05/05/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20100 |
|
|
27/02/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|