Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1407 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19210 Week
» 72226 Month
» 191753 Year
» 3218606 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8095 |
26/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20095 |
01/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) |
20305 |
08/05/1996 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/10/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/10/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/10/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8095 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20095 |
|
|
08/05/1996 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20305 |
|
|