Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1017 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6801 Week
» 28190 Month
» 147717 Year
» 3174570 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8087 |
26/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20087 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/09/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
04/1995 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/09/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/07/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
15/07/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8087 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20087 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20087 |
|
|