Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1591 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14997 Week
» 68013 Month
» 187540 Year
» 3214393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D808 |
08/07/1959 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
CENTAUR |
08/07/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
08/07/1959 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,238,000 miles |
Cut Up |
25/02/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D808, name: CENTAUR Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 808 |
|
|
25/02/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|