Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32090 Week
» 130735 Month
» 333399 Year
» 3360252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8077 |
28/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20077 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2983/8235 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/07/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
16/05/1988 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
on 21/05/1990 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
28/07/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8077 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2983 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20077 |
|
|
16/05/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20077 |
|
|
21/05/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|