Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2496 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23915 Week
» 46886 Month
» 393310 Year
» 3420163 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8074 |
19/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20074 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
19/07/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8074 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2980 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20074 |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20074 |
|
|
30/11/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|