Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 134 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30784 Week
» 129429 Month
» 332093 Year
» 3358946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8073 |
19/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20073 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2979/8231 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
19/07/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
23/12/1993 |
Time in Service |
32 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
on 14/04/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
19/07/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8073 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2979 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20073 |
|
|
23/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20073 |
|
|
14/04/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|