Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1736 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7520 Week
» 28909 Month
» 148436 Year
» 3175289 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8059 |
12/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20059 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (BR)) |
20302 |
15/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (20/0 (R)) |
20059 |
11/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2965/8217 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/05/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
05/1993 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/05/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/05/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8059 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2965 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20059 |
|
|
15/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20302 |
|
|
11/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20059 |
|
|
05/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20059 |
|
|