Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2305 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32955 Week
» 131600 Month
» 334264 Year
» 3361117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8054 |
12/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20054 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
11/09/1989 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
Cut Up |
on 14/10/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/06/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8054 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20054 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/09/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20054 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|