Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 605 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31255 Week
» 129900 Month
» 332564 Year
» 3359417 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8050 |
02/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20128 |
07/11/1973 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) |
20307 |
11/03/1998 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
02/03/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
02/03/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/03/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8050 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20128 |
|
|
11/03/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20307 |
|
|