Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3271 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29305 Week
» 127950 Month
» 330614 Year
» 3357467 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D804 |
23/04/1959 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
AVENGER |
23/04/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
437 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted | Multiple Fitting | White Diamond |
|
To Service |
23/04/1959 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,206,000 miles |
Cut Up |
on 24/03/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D804, name: AVENGER Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 804 |
|
|
24/03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|