Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 371 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6155 Week
» 27544 Month
» 147071 Year
» 3173924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8035 |
18/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20035 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
18/09/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1991 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
18/09/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1975 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/09/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8035 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20035 |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20035 |
|
|