Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 861 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6645 Week
» 28034 Month
» 147561 Year
» 3174414 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8031 |
20/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20031 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
20/01/1960 to Kittybrewster (61A) |
Withdrawn |
14/09/1990 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys |
Cut Up |
17/09/1991 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
20/01/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1984 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1984 |
|
Guard brake valve fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1984 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
22/03/2011 |
Link |
www.kwvr.co.uk |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8031 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20031 |
|
|
01/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Guard brake valve fitted |
|
|
14/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20031 |
|
|
17/09/1991 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|