Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 277 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6061 Week
» 27450 Month
» 146977 Year
» 3173830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8020 |
03/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20020 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
03/10/1959 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/1990 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
03/10/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8020 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20020 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
01/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20020 |
|
|