Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 171 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17974 Week
» 70990 Month
» 190517 Year
» 3217370 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8016 |
30/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20016 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
30/12/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
Withdrawn |
04/1995 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
30/12/1957 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8016 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20016 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20016 |
|
|