Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1912 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15318 Week
» 68334 Month
» 187861 Year
» 3214714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8014 |
16/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20014 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
16/12/1957 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8014 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20014 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
20/12/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
27/03/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20014 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|