Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2958 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16364 Week
» 69380 Month
» 188907 Year
» 3215760 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D801 |
07/11/1958 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
VANGUARD |
07/11/1958 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
42 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
428 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 1 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
07/11/1958 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
03/08/1968 |
Time in Service |
9 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
Total Mileage |
855,560 miles |
Cut Up |
24/10/1970 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
83D |
|
Laira (New) |
on |
07/11/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/08/1968 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/11/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/06/1963 |
Severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
11/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D801, name: VANGUARD Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
03/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 801 |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|